Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Viktor Burić

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia

Note/Previous Titular See: (AA of the Croatian portion)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1897Born
27 Jun 192022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
21 May 193537.7AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
21 Jul 193537.8Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
15 Dec 195154.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
20 Aug 196971.9AppointedArchbishop of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
18 Apr 197476.6RetiredArchbishop of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
28 Aug 198385.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Viktor Burić
Archbishop Viktor Burić (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rijeka-Senj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRijeka

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1935, Number 52
  • aadm: CB, 29 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast