Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ivan Devcic

Archbishop of Rijeka, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1948 Born
28 Jun 197527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
17 Nov 200052.8AppointedArchbishop of Rijeka, Croatia
16 Dec 200052.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rijeka, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Devcic
Archbishop Ivan Devcic (born ) Archbishop of Rijeka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrasno Polje

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Rijeka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,869

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast