Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antun Bogetić

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Poreč i Pula, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1922Born
29 Jun 194624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
27 Jan 198461.7AppointedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
28 Apr 198462.0Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
18 Nov 199775.5RetiredBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
19 Apr 201794.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Poreč i Pula, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antun Bogetić (VIAF: 305477898)
Bishop Antun Bogetić (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Poreč i Pula

EventPlace
Birth PlacePremantura
Death PlacePriests House of Bethany, Pula, Diocese of Poreč i Pula

  • a priest for 70.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017