Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Johannes Först, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1926BornGunzendorf-Buttenheim, Germany
29 Jun 195225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
6 Jul 198861.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
7 Sep 198861.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
12 May 199063.4SucceededBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
5 Dec 200175.0RetiredBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
1 Nov 201487.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alberto Johannes Först:
Bishop Alberto Johannes Först O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dourados

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,013
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 1 Nov 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015