Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederico Heimler, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1942Born
12 Jul 197028.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Dec 199856.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil
31 Jan 199956.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil
8 May 200260.2AppointedBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
11 Jun 201472.3ResignedBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Nov 201876.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Frederico Heimler
Bishop Frederico Heimler S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUnterlammerthal, Germany
Ordained BishopGinásio coberto, Corumbá, Diocese of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul
Death PlaceCampo Grande, Archdiocese of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul
Buried Place (Original)Salesian, Cemetery, Campo Grande, Archdiocese of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,467
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2014
  • d: CB, 7 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Nov 2018

Quantcast