Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Livingstone

Dioecesis Livingstonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Raymond Mpezele, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 April 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lusaka
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zambia
  • Square Kilometers: 58,200 (22,479 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 60138, Livingstone, Zambia
  • Telephone: (03)321.667
  • Fax: 324.280

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Victoria Falls
25 May 1936ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Broken Hill Prefecture Apostolic of Victoria Falls (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Livingstone
10 March 1950ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Victoria Falls Vicariate Apostolic of Livingstone
Diocese of Livingstone
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Livingstone Diocese of Livingstone
14 June 1997Territory LostDiocese of Livingstone Diocese of Mongu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Livingstone
19503,428358,0001.0%2020171218ap1951
Diocese of Livingstone
197051,869562,0009.2%44441,17866105ap1971
198057,399554,00010.4%232341,6886310823ap1981
199087,906776,00011.3%1151621,41710711823ap1991
199952,501348,43215.1%926351,500314312ap2000
200053,610355,75815.1%1020301,787274912ap2001
200156,532410,50313.8%1019291,949264912ap2002
200268,828410,67216.8%1421351,966295412ap2003
200367,828411,34616.5%1823411,654355512ap2004
200469,810419,06016.7%1420342,053285314ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 31 May 2013