Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moses Hamungole

Bishop of Monze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1967 BornKafue
6 Aug 199427.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lusaka, Zambia
10 Feb 201446.8AppointedBishop of Monze, Zambia
3 May 201447.0Ordained BishopBishop of Monze, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Moses Hamungole:
Bishop Moses Hamungole (born ) Bishop of Monze

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Monze.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 1 Mar 2014
  • c2: CB, 4 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 5 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 May 2014