Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Gottau, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Añatuya, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1917Born
2 Feb 193820.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Dec 194225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Jun 196144.0AppointedBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
27 Aug 196144.2Ordained BishopBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
1 Oct 196144.3InstalledBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
21 Dec 199275.5RetiredBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
24 Apr 199476.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Añatuya, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Gottau
Bishop Jorge Gottau C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Añatuya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGazcón

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast