Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Montagnoli, C.S.S.

Bishop of Ilhéus, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1945 BornOuro Fino
24 Jan 197125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
20 Dec 199550.4AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
24 Feb 199650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mauro Montagnoli:
Bishop Mauro Montagnoli C.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Ilhéus

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ilhéus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,686
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015