Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Crisanto Darío Mata Cova

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1915Born
8 Apr 193923.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 194933.9AppointedBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
13 Nov 194934.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
30 Apr 196650.5AppointedArchbishop of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela
26 May 198670.5RetiredArchbishop of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela
9 Jan 199882.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Crisanto Darío Mata Cova
Archbishop Crisanto Darío Mata Cova (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ciudad Bolívar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José de Areocuar

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast