Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Pagis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1835BornPléaux
22 Sep 186025.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 188246.7SelectedBishop of Tarentaise, France
30 Mar 188246.7ConfirmedBishop of Tarentaise, France
29 Jun 188247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
17 May 188751.8SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
26 May 188751.9ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
29 Mar 190165.7ResignedBishop of Verdun, France
18 Nov 190873.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Pagis:
Bishop Jean-Pierre Pagis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 535, and Page 592

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013