Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert-Léon-Marie Le Nordez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dijon, France

Titular Bishop of Dionysiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1844Born
6 Jun 186824.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 189652.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Verdun, France
25 Jun 189652.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
9 Aug 189652.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
7 Jul 189854.2SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
28 Nov 189854.6ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
4 Sep 190460.3ResignedBishop of Dijon, France
9 Dec 192177.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiopolis
29 Jan 192277.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Albert-Léon-Marie Le Nordez (VIAF: 46752309)
Bishop Albert-Léon-Marie Le Nordez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontebourg

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 117, and Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017