Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Marie-Frédéric Bouange

Deceased

Bishop of Langres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1814BornAurillac
9 Jun 183824.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 187763.4SelectedBishop of Langres, France
21 Sep 187763.6ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
18 Nov 187763.8Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
5 May 188470.2DiedBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Marie-Frédéric Bouange:
Bishop Guillaume-Marie-Frédéric Bouange (born , died ) Bishop of Langres

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015