Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Natale Paganelli, S.X.

Apostolic Administrator of Makeni, Sierra Leone

Titular Bishop of Gadiaufala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1956 Born
31 Aug 197518.6ProfessedMember of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
3 Dec 197922.9Perpetual VowsMember of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
25 Dec 198024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
11 Apr 201255.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Makeni, Sierra Leone
18 Jul 201558.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
31 Oct 201558.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala

MicroData Summary for Natale Paganelli
Bishop Natale Paganelli S.X. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Makeni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrignano di Brembate, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Makeni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2015
  • ab/aadm: CB, 18 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 3 Aug 2015
  • c2: CB, 30 Oct 2015
  • c34: CB, 31 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,667

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018