Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Libardo Garcés Monsalve

Bishop of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1967 Born
27 Nov 199326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Manizales, Colombia
29 Jun 201648.7AppointedBishop of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia
1 Sep 201648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia
1 Oct 201649.0InstalledBishop of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Libardo Garcés Monsalve
Bishop José Libardo Garcés Monsalve (born ) Bishop of Málaga-Soatá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAguadas
Ordained BishopCathédrale Basilique, Manizales, Archdiocese of Manizales

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Málaga-Soatá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2016
  • ob/i/c2: CB, 29 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 30 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,089

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast