Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celso Nogoy Guevarra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Balanga, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1923Born
10 Apr 194926.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 197249.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Fernando, Philippines
20 Jun 197249.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vannida
28 Aug 197249.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vannida
4 Jun 197552.4AppointedBishop of Balanga, Philippines
8 Apr 199875.2RetiredBishop of Balanga, Philippines
13 Aug 200279.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Balanga, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Celso Nogoy Guevarra
Bishop Celso Nogoy Guevarra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Balanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapas

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 25 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 May 2018

Quantcast