Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert James Cartwright

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

Titular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1900Born
11 Jun 192726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Aug 195655.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
3 Aug 195655.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
24 Oct 195656.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
6 Mar 195857.5DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for Hubert James Cartwright
Bishop Hubert James Cartwright (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Wilmington

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Germantown, PA, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 94
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast