Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Anthony DeSimone

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Cillium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1922Born
10 May 195230.2Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
27 Jun 198159.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
27 Jun 198159.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cillium
12 Aug 198159.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cillium
5 Apr 199775.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Oct 201896.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Anthony DeSimone
Bishop Louis Anthony DeSimone (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral Basilica, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceVillanova, PA

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: CB, 5 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Oct 2018

Quantcast