Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Odongo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tororo, Uganda

Bishop of Uganda, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1931Born
22 Dec 195625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tororo, Uganda
25 Nov 196433.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tororo, Uganda
25 Nov 196433.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bahanna
16 Feb 196533.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bahanna
19 Aug 196837.3AppointedBishop of Tororo, Uganda
5 Jan 198553.7AppointedBishop of Uganda, Military
2 Jan 199967.7AppointedArchbishop of Tororo, Uganda
27 Jun 200776.2RetiredArchbishop of Tororo, Uganda
4 Dec 202089.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tororo, Uganda

MicroData Summary for James Odongo
(WikiData: Q1680912)
Archbishop James Odongo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tororo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolo, Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}
Ordained BishopTororo, Diocese of Tororo
Death PlaceSt. Francis Nsambya, Hospital, Kampala, Archdiocese of Kampala

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 55.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 4 Dec 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1965, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 7 Aug 2023