Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Bernard Louis Willigers, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jinja, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1930Born
5 May 195423.5ProfessedMember of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
10 Jul 195524.7Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
13 Jul 196736.7AppointedBishop of Jinja, Uganda
3 Dec 196737.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jinja, Uganda
2 Mar 201079.3RetiredBishop of Jinja, Uganda
30 Sep 201281.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Jinja, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Bernard Louis Willigers
Bishop Joseph Bernard Louis Willigers M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jinja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGronsveld, Netherlands

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast