Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Oyanga

Bishop Emeritus of Lira, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1936 Born
15 May 196327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lira, Uganda
4 Jul 198953.3AppointedBishop of Lira, Uganda
1 Oct 198953.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lira, Uganda
2 Dec 200367.7ResignedBishop of Lira, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Oyanga
Bishop Joseph Oyanga (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOmoro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,278
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast