Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmus Desiderius Wandera

Bishop Emeritus of Soroti, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1930 Born
27 Dec 195626.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 198050.6AppointedBishop of Soroti, Uganda
29 Mar 198150.9Ordained BishopBishop of Soroti, Uganda
27 Jun 200777.1RetiredBishop of Soroti, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Erasmus Desiderius Wandera
Bishop Erasmus Desiderius Wandera (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Soroti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDabani

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Soroti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018