Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bernard Delany (Delaney)

Deceased

Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1864Born
23 May 189126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
18 Apr 190439.6AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
8 Sep 190440.0Ordained BishopBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
11 Jun 190641.8DiedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for John Bernard Delany (Delaney)
Bishop John Bernard Delany (Delaney) (born , died ) Bishop of Manchester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLowell, MA

  • a priest for 15.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast