Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bertram Peterson

Deceased

Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1871BornSalem
15 Sep 189928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
7 Oct 192756.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
7 Oct 192756.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
10 Nov 192756.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
13 May 193260.8AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
15 Mar 194472.7DiedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for John Bertram Peterson:
Bishop John Bertram Peterson (born , died ) Bishop of Manchester

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013