Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino N. Mazzarella, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1904BornMirabella Eclano, Italy
5 Jun 193127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Nov 195450.6AppointedPrelate of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho, Honduras
20 Jul 195753.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Pisidia
18 Oct 195753.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Pisidia
13 Mar 196358.9AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
30 May 197975.1DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Bernardino N. Mazzarella:
Bishop Bernardino N. Mazzarella O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Comayagua

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013