Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Nilan

Deceased

Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1855Born
21 Dec 187823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
17 Feb 191054.5AppointedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
28 Apr 191054.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
13 Apr 193478.6DiedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Nilan
Bishop John Joseph Nilan (born , died ) Bishop of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewburyport

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,316
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast