Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Olliffe

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India

Titular Bishop of Milo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1813¹Born
26 Aug 184330.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Bengal, India
26 Aug 184330.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Milo
8 Oct 184330.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milo
15 Feb 185037.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India
15 Feb 185037.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Bengal, India
2 Nov 185542.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India
13 May 185946.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Olliffe
Bishop Thomas Olliffe (born 1813, died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Bengal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIreland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cork, Diocese of Cork, Ireland

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast