Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1823Born
25 Mar 184824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
30 Jun 187652.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nebraska, USA
30 Jun 187652.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
20 Aug 187652.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
24 Sep 187653.0InstalledVicar Apostolic of Nebraska, USA
2 Oct 188562.0AppointedBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
27 May 189066.7DiedBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for James O’Connor
Bishop James O’Connor (born , died ) Bishop of Omaha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCobh, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt Charles Seminary, Chapel, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 245, and Page 425
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017