Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Phelan

Deceased

Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1828Born
4 May 185426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
12 May 188557.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
12 May 188557.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cibyra
2 Aug 188557.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cibyra
7 Dec 188961.9SucceededBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Dec 190476.9DiedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Phelan
(WikiData: Q7328399)
Bishop Richard Phelan (born , died ) Bishop of Pittsburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallyragget, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Ordained PriestPittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Cathedral, Pittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceIdlewood, PA

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 204, and Page 457
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 50
  • c1: CB, 19 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 6 Dec 2022