Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale de Lucia

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1802Born
24 Sep 182522.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 185249.6SelectedBishop of Gerace, Italy
27 Sep 185249.8ConfirmedBishop of Gerace, Italy
29 Sep 185249.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
11 Jun 186057.5DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale de Lucia (VIAF: 89196291)
Bishop Pasquale de Lucia (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatanzaro
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 304
  • c34: CB, 25 Mar 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,852, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast