Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Keith Michael Patrick Cardinal O’Brien

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Gioacchino ed Anna al Tuscolano

Note/Previous Titular See: (Resigned Cardinal "rights and privileges" on 20 Mar 2015)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1938Born
3 Apr 196527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
30 May 198547.2AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Aug 198547.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
Jun 199658.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
Oct 199961.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Oct 200365.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200365.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Gioacchino ed Anna al Tuscolano
25 Feb 201374.9RetiredArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Mar 201880.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Keith Michael Patrick O’Brien
Keith Michael Patrick Cardinal O’Brien (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallycastle, County Antrim, Northern Ireland, Diocese of Down and Connor, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Death PlaceRoyal Victoria, Hospital, Newcastle-upon-Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Buried Place (Original)Mount Vernon, Cemetery, Edinburgh, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
  • a cardinal for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2013
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2013, Page 73*
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: CB, 19 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast