Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ian Murray

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1932Born
17 Mar 195623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
3 Nov 199966.8AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Dec 199966.9Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
16 Oct 200875.8RetiredBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Jan 201683.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ian Murray
Bishop Ian Murray (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Argyll and The Isles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLennoxtown, Glasgow, Dumbartonshire, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained PriestScots, College, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Columba, Cathedral, Oban, Argyll, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland
Death PlaceSt. Joseph's Home, Nursing Home, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Pennyfuir, Cemetery, Oban, Argyll, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,652
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast