Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Lawrence Rafferty

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Ausuaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1933Born
2 Jun 195723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Jun 199056.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Jun 199056.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuaga
15 Aug 199057.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuaga
19 Apr 199662.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Kevin Lawrence Rafferty
Bishop Kevin Lawrence Rafferty (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarvagh, Coleraine, County Derry, Diocese of Derry, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Cathedral, Kilkenny City, County Kilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Death PlaceSts. John Cantius and Nicholas, Church, Bathgate, West Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Glenullin, Cemetery, Garvagh, County Derry, Diocese of Derry, Ireland

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,075
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast