Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moses Chikwe

Auxiliary Bishop of Owerri, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Flumenzer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1967 Born
6 Jul 199629.2Ordained PriestPriest of Owerri, Nigeria
17 Oct 201952.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Owerri, Nigeria
17 Oct 201952.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Flumenzer
12 Dec 201952.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flumenzer

MicroData Summary for Moses Chikwe
Bishop Moses Chikwe (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Owerri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUzoagba-Ikeduru, Diocese of Owerri
Ordained BishopMaria Assumpta, Cathedral, Owerri, Archdiocese of Owerri

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Owerri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2019
  • ob: CB, 17 Oct 2019
  • c2+: CB, 7 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast