Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilary Nanman Dachelem, C.M.F.

Bishop of Bauchi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1966 Born
8 Sep 198822.2First VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
13 Sep 199327.2Perpetual VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
1 Jul 199529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
31 May 201750.9AppointedBishop of Bauchi, Nigeria
17 Aug 201751.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bauchi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Hilary Nanman Dachelem
Bishop Hilary Nanman Dachelem C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of Bauchi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMakurdi
Ordained BishopMultipurpose Indoor Sports Hall, Bauchi, Diocese of Bauchi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bauchi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 6 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 17 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,498

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018