Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Euzébius Chinekezy Ogbonna Managwu

Bishop of Port-Gentil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1959 BornN’Djaména
1 Nov 199232.8Ordained PriestPriest of Libreville, Gabon
12 Jan 201656.0AppointedBishop of Port-Gentil, Gabon
3 Apr 201656.3Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Gentil, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Euzébius Chinekezy Ogbonna Managwu
Bishop Euzébius Chinekezy Ogbonna Managwu (born ) Bishop of Port-Gentil

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port-Gentil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 25 Feb 2016
  • c24: CB, 3 Apr 2016
  • c3: CB, 4 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 Apr 2016