Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Zadarko

Auxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

Titular Bishop of Cavaillon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1960 BornSłupsk
25 May 198625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
16 Feb 200948.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
16 Feb 200948.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cavaillon
25 Apr 200948.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cavaillon

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Zadarko:
Bishop Krzysztof Zadarko (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013