Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ján Orosch

Archbishop of Trnava, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1953 Born
6 Jun 197623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
2 Apr 200450.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia
2 Apr 200450.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Semina
2 May 200450.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Semina
14 Feb 200854.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trnava, Slovakia
2 Jul 201259.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trnava, Slovakia
11 Jul 201360.1AppointedArchbishop of Trnava, Slovakia
30 Aug 201360.2InstalledArchbishop of Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Orosch
Archbishop Ján Orosch (born ) Archbishop of Trnava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBratislava

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trnava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 2 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,586
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast