Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Bartimej Tencer, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Reykjavik, Iceland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1963 Born
15 Jun 198623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
28 Aug 199431.2Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Sep 201552.3AppointedBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland
31 Oct 201552.4Ordained BishopBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland

MicroData Summary for David Bartimej Tencer
Bishop David Bartimej Tencer O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Reykjavik

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNová Baňa, Slovakia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Reykjavik.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2015
  • mn/ob: CB, 18 Sep 2015
  • c2+: CB, 28 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast