Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rolando José Álvarez Lagos

Bishop of Matagalpa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1966 BornManagua
7 Dec 199428.0Ordained PriestPriest of Managua, Nicaragua
8 Mar 201144.3AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
2 Apr 201144.3Ordained BishopBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Rolando José Álvarez Lagos:
Bishop Rolando José Álvarez Lagos (born ) Bishop of Matagalpa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Matagalpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,983

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013