Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Castor Sekwa

Deceased

Bishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1927Born
15 Aug 195932.3Ordained PriestPriest of Shinyanga, Tanzania
30 Jan 197547.8AppointedBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania
18 May 197548.1Ordained BishopBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania
4 Jun 199669.1DiedBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Castor Sekwa
Bishop Castor Sekwa (born , died ) Bishop of Shinyanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSayusayu

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast