Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Nin, O.S.B.

Apostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)

Titular Bishop of Carcabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1956 BornEl Vendrell, Spain
26 Apr 197720.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Oct 198024.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Nov 199741.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Apr 199841.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Feb 201659.4AppointedApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)
2 Feb 201659.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carcabia
15 Apr 201659.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carcabia
29 May 201659.7InstalledApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)

MicroData Summary for Manuel Nin
Bishop Manuel Nin O.S.B. (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Greece

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Greece (Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2016
  • od/c1: CB, 2 Feb 2016
  • c2: CB, 1 Mar 2016
  • i: CB, 14 Apr 2016
  • c34: CB, 15 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 19 Apr 2016