Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Schubert

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ceramussa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1890BornBucuresti, Romania
15 Jul 191626.0Ordained PriestPriest
Jun 1950³59.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramussa
30 Jun 195060.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramussa
4 Apr 196978.7DiedTitular Bishop of Ceramussa

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Schubert:
Bishop Joseph Schubert (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Ceramussa

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013