Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
8 Jan 1966 | Born | ||
11 Oct 1997 | 31.7 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria |
8 Apr 2024 | 58.2 | Appointed | Bishop of Saint John XXIII of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria |
(WikiData: Q125390773)
Father
Petko
Valov
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of Saint John XXIII of Sofia
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Sofia, Apostolic Exarchate of Sofia (Bulgarian) |
Please contact the Father through the Eparchy of Saint John XXIII of Sofia (Bulgarian).
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 14 Apr 2024 |
✠