Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Sozzo

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Morocco

Titular Archbishop of Concordia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1942 BornPaola, Italy
28 Aug 197129.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 199553.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Concordia
5 Aug 199553.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Algeria
5 Aug 199553.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tunisia
14 Oct 199553.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Concordia
23 May 199856.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
17 Jul 200361.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Morocco
16 Sep 201573.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Morocco

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sozzo
Archbishop Antonio Sozzo (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Morocco

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Morocco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,621
  • r: CB, 3 Sep 2015
  • r: CB, 21 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Feb 2016