Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildefonso (Matteo Renato) Rea, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Montecassino, Italy

Titular Bishop of Corone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1896Born
17 Oct 191519.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Oct 192024.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Oct 192125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Feb 192933.1AppointedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
25 May 192933.3InstalledAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
21 Nov 194549.8ConfirmedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
8 Dec 194549.9InstalledAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
10 Feb 196367.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Corone
12 Mar 196367.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corone
17 Apr 197175.2RetiredAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
23 Sep 197175.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Montecassino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso (Matteo Renato) Rea
Bishop Ildefonso (Matteo Renato) Rea O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Montecassino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArpino

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • sole/i: CB, 18 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast