Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Nguyễn Văn Mầu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1914Born
21 Sep 194026.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 196854.4AppointedBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
12 Sep 196854.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
3 Jul 200187.4RetiredBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
31 Jan 201399.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jacques Nguyễn Văn Mầu
Bishop Jacques Nguyễn Văn Mầu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vĩnh Long

EventPlace
Birth PlaceB Ria

  • a priest for 72.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 1 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast