Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Nguyên Văn Tân

Deceased

Bishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1940Born
21 Dec 196928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
10 May 200059.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
15 Aug 200059.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
3 Jul 200160.5SucceededBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
17 Aug 201372.6DiedBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Thomas Nguyên Văn Tân
Bishop Thomas Nguyên Văn Tân (born , died ) Bishop of Vĩnh Long

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBai Xan

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,819
  • d: CB, 18 Aug 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast