Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Damian Denis Dallu

Archbishop of Songea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1955 BornKiponzelo
15 Nov 198429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Geita, Tanzania
14 Apr 200044.9AppointedBishop of Geita, Tanzania
30 Jul 200045.2Ordained BishopBishop of Geita, Tanzania
14 Mar 201458.8AppointedArchbishop of Songea, Tanzania
18 May 201459.0InstalledArchbishop of Songea, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Damian Denis Dallu:
Archbishop Damian Denis Dallu (born ) Archbishop of Songea

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Songea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,810
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2014
  • i: CB, 6 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015