Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Joseph Maria Zeiger (Zelger), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dar-es-Salaam

Titular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1867BornStans, Switzerland
25 Mar 189022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Feb 192355.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
16 Feb 192355.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
24 Jun 192355.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
5 Jul 192961.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
20 Aug 193466.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Joseph Maria Zeiger (Zelger):
Bishop Gabriel Joseph Maria Zeiger (Zelger) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dar-es-Salaam

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013